Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOT08069 | TRINDALL Ross | East Coast Hockey Club | 28/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08075 | WARREN Barbara | Spotlight | 28/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08080 | YOUNG Sandra | Bungay District Guiding | 28/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08082 | BEE Mark | Lowestoft Constituency Conservative Association | 14/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08083 | GOLDSMITH Joan | Southwold Millennium Foundation | 14/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08085 | BLOWERS Deborah | Beccles and Bungay Area Community Transport | 20/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08096 | WOOLNER Simon John | Halesworth PCC | 03/01/2024 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08097 | SMITH Richard | Lowestoft & Yarmouth RUFC | 22/11/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08132 | ORMSBY David | Junior Leaders Regiment Royal Engineers Branch | 08/01/2024 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |
LOT08137 | KEYZOR Gary | Lowestoft Town Football Club | 25/01/2024 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2024 |