Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
WPHO021 | HOWLETT Patrick Arthur | P and S Hire | 06/06/2022 | 06/06/2022 | 09/06/2027 |
WPHO042 | BAKER Peter | P B Executive Travel | 15/03/2022 | 15/03/2022 | 14/03/2027 |
WPHO101 | BERRY Paula | P J Waylands Ltd | 12/09/2023 | 01/09/2023 | 31/08/2028 |
WPHO126 | OVERY Philip John | PJ Overy t/a Angies Tours | 22/03/2023 | 30/08/2024 | 21/03/2028 |
WPHO131 | WILKES Steven Mark | Posh Ridez | 24/08/2023 | 24/08/2023 | 23/08/2028 |
WPHO001 | KEMP Robert James | R J's Private Hire | 16/09/2022 | 16/09/2022 | 09/11/2027 |
WPHO108 | REARIE Angela | Rainbows Transport | 07/03/2023 | 07/03/2023 | 30/09/2027 |
WPHO026 | BRIGHTY Andrew Carl | Road Runners/Andalusia Trading Ltd | 26/10/2022 | 16/06/2023 | 13/11/2027 |
WPHO109 | TEKAGAC Ergun | Seven Star | 21/02/2023 | 01/02/2023 | 31/01/2028 |
WPHO124 | NARANAYAGE Prakash R M K | SPRY Management | 12/01/2023 | 13/09/2023 | 11/01/2028 |