Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
WPHO135 | CHILVERS WILKINS Kelly | CW Private Hire | 17/07/2024 | 17/07/2024 | 16/07/2029 |
WPHO134 | LEACH Mervyn William | Mervyn Leach | 21/06/2024 | 21/06/2024 | 20/06/2029 |
WPHO133 | BOORMAN Stephen John | Out n About Cars | 16/04/2024 | 16/04/2024 | 15/04/2029 |
WPHO132 | PICKESS Jonathan Keith | Zed Cars | 02/11/2023 | 09/11/2023 | 01/11/2028 |
WPHO131 | WILKES Steven Mark | Posh Ridez | 24/08/2023 | 24/08/2023 | 23/08/2028 |
WPHO130 | WARNER Glen | CDK Private Hire | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2023 | 29/05/2028 |
WPHO128 | WILKINS Peter Sean | Voltaire Private Hire | 02/05/2023 | 02/05/2023 | 01/05/2028 |
WPHO127 | TODD Russell James | First Choice Executive Hire | 20/04/2023 | 20/04/2023 | 19/04/2028 |
WPHO126 | OVERY Philip John | PJ Overy t/a Angies Tours | 22/03/2023 | 30/08/2024 | 21/03/2028 |
WPHO125 | USEF Ako Abdula | Jackos Private Hire | 13/03/2023 | 24/04/2024 | 12/03/2028 |