Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
WPHO018 | SUTTON Michael | Kessingland Kabs Ltd | 05/05/2021 | 04/03/2024 | 07/05/2027 |
WPHO116 | JINKS Emma | Wherry Travel | 28/08/2020 | 28/08/2020 | 27/08/2025 |
WPHO115 | SEPPINGS Bryony Jane | First Point Luxury Private Hire | 18/02/2020 | 18/02/2020 | 17/02/2025 |