Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
WPHO134 | LEACH Mervyn William | Mervyn Leach | 21/06/2024 | 21/06/2024 | 20/06/2029 |
WPHO135 | CHILVERS WILKINS Kelly | CW Private Hire | 17/07/2024 | 17/07/2024 | 16/07/2029 |
WPHO126 | OVERY Philip John | PJ Overy t/a Angies Tours | 22/03/2023 | 30/08/2024 | 21/03/2028 |