Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
WPHO019 | FOSDIKE David Robert | D R Fosdike Ltd | 14/04/2022 | 14/04/2022 | 20/05/2027 |
WPHO021 | HOWLETT Patrick Arthur | P and S Hire | 06/06/2022 | 06/06/2022 | 09/06/2027 |
WPHO116 | JINKS Emma | Wherry Travel | 28/08/2020 | 28/08/2020 | 27/08/2025 |
WPHO001 | KEMP Robert James | R J's Private Hire | 16/09/2022 | 16/09/2022 | 09/11/2027 |
WPHO134 | LEACH Mervyn William | Mervyn Leach | 21/06/2024 | 21/06/2024 | 20/06/2029 |
WPHO017 | MCLAREN Stacey | 51 Taxis Ltd | 06/04/2022 | 08/04/2022 | 07/04/2027 |
WPHO124 | NARANAYAGE Prakash R M K | SPRY Management | 12/01/2023 | 13/09/2023 | 11/01/2028 |
WPHO126 | OVERY Philip John | PJ Overy t/a Angies Tours | 22/03/2023 | 30/08/2024 | 21/03/2028 |
WPHO117 | PETTY Allan David | A P Travel Transfers | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2021 | 30/06/2026 |
WPHO132 | PICKESS Jonathan Keith | Zed Cars | 02/11/2023 | 09/11/2023 | 01/11/2028 |