Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD6914 | CRACKNELL Trevor Colin | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8130 | RIGBY Anthony Christopher | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD6609 | WHITING Mark | 23/01/2023 | 23/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD6620 | CODLING Paul | 23/01/2023 | 23/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8304 | YILDIZ Erdinc | 20/01/2023 | 16/12/2022 | 30/11/2025 |
PHD8235 | MIRANDA Hugo Manuel | 18/01/2023 | 18/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8067 | POMEROY Gary Robert | 11/01/2023 | 11/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8310 | MEEN-ROBERTS Darren Lee | 11/01/2023 | 11/01/2023 | 31/12/2025 |
PHD8308 | CORDICE Daniel Terence Calvin | 04/01/2023 | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2025 |
PHD8309 | VATTER Georgia Caroline | 04/01/2023 | 19/08/2024 | 31/12/2025 |