Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD8348 | STALLEY Scott | 11/09/2023 | 11/09/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8347 | GREEN Peter | 08/09/2023 | 08/09/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8178 | CORBIN Neville James | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8344 | GOODWIN Tracey Marie | 01/09/2023 | 30/07/2024 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8345 | CRIPPS Roger Alfred | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD6026 | GRADY Gerald | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8007 | AMZAD Zahangir | 16/08/2023 | 16/08/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8340 | FOWLE Simon Robert Andrew | 08/08/2023 | 08/08/2023 | 31/07/2026 |
PHD8147 | LIBERT-SIMONS Allan James | 27/07/2023 | 27/07/2023 | 31/07/2026 |
PHD8314 | QADERI Dara | 21/07/2023 | 20/06/2024 | 12/02/2025 |