Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD8310 | MEEN-ROBERTS Darren Lee | 11/01/2023 | 11/01/2023 | 31/12/2025 |
PHD8067 | POMEROY Gary Robert | 11/01/2023 | 11/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8235 | MIRANDA Hugo Manuel | 18/01/2023 | 18/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8304 | YILDIZ Erdinc | 20/01/2023 | 16/12/2022 | 30/11/2025 |
PHD6609 | WHITING Mark | 23/01/2023 | 23/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD6620 | CODLING Paul | 23/01/2023 | 23/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD6914 | CRACKNELL Trevor Colin | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8130 | RIGBY Anthony Christopher | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8237 | CHURCH Tina Maria | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8316 | YOUSSEF Mohamed Abd El Gawad | 15/02/2023 | 15/02/2023 | 31/01/2026 |