Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD7056 | HEYWORTH Robert | 29/07/2024 | 26/06/2023 | 30/06/2025 |
PHD8111 | HIND David Michael | 17/06/2022 | 17/06/2022 | 30/06/2025 |
PHD8374 | KHDIR Kodo | 13/02/2024 | 13/02/2024 | 24/06/2025 |
PHD6957 | CHATTENTON Sally Lesley | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2022 | 31/05/2025 |
PHD1399 | PRICE Roger | 09/05/2022 | 09/05/2022 | 31/05/2025 |
PHD6403 | WARNE Adrian Dale | 27/05/2022 | 27/05/2022 | 31/05/2025 |
PHD8306 | HEWLETT Philip Arthur | 19/08/2024 | 20/12/2022 | 31/05/2025 |
PHD8282 | VETRA Janis | 01/12/2022 | 30/05/2022 | 31/05/2025 |
PHD8283 | HUSSEIN Karwan Kawa Pirdawood | 08/07/2022 | 27/06/2022 | 31/05/2025 |
PHD8402 | ABDULLAH Maryam | 09/09/2024 | 09/09/2024 | 24/05/2025 |