Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD8377 | FISK Andrew Ronald | 13/05/2024 | 15/03/2024 | 28/02/2027 |
PHD6822 | ARNOLD David Peter | 25/03/2024 | 25/03/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8082 | BROOKS Stephen | 09/02/2024 | 12/02/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8182 | ROGERS Wendy Ann | 07/02/2024 | 07/02/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8378 | BRIDGE Robert Charles | 25/03/2024 | 25/03/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8379 | LESNIEWSKI Tadeusz | 19/08/2024 | 25/03/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8381 | MOHIALDEEN Sazan | 15/04/2024 | 08/04/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8382 | BULKELEY Roger Justus | 16/04/2024 | 16/04/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8383 | CHILTON Nanette | 17/04/2024 | 01/07/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8386 | PEACOCK James Daniel | 24/04/2024 | 24/04/2024 | 31/03/2027 |