Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD8381 | MOHIALDEEN Sazan | 15/04/2024 | 08/04/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8380 | BACI Bruno | 27/03/2024 | 27/03/2024 | 18/04/2025 |
PHD6822 | ARNOLD David Peter | 25/03/2024 | 25/03/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8378 | BRIDGE Robert Charles | 25/03/2024 | 25/03/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8379 | LESNIEWSKI Tadeusz | 19/08/2024 | 25/03/2024 | 31/03/2027 |
PHD8377 | FISK Andrew Ronald | 13/05/2024 | 15/03/2024 | 28/02/2027 |
PHD8365 | ALI Ejaz | 18/12/2023 | 14/03/2024 | 15/08/2026 |
PHD6694 | PERRIER Noel Leslie | 19/10/2021 | 23/02/2024 | 30/09/2024 |
PHD8373 | JALALZADEH Sardar Jabar | 13/02/2024 | 13/02/2024 | 30/07/2026 |
PHD8374 | KHDIR Kodo | 13/02/2024 | 13/02/2024 | 24/06/2025 |