Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
PHD8329 | DAVIES Stephen Roy | 22/05/2023 | 22/05/2023 | 30/04/2026 |
PHD8345 | CRIPPS Roger Alfred | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD6914 | CRACKNELL Trevor Colin | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8308 | CORDICE Daniel Terence Calvin | 04/01/2023 | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2025 |
PHD8178 | CORBIN Neville James | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2023 | 31/08/2026 |
PHD8262 | CORBETT Michael Joseph | 15/08/2024 | 27/10/2021 | 31/10/2024 |
PHD8404 | CONSTANTIN Avram | 13/09/2024 | 13/09/2024 | 31/08/2027 |
PHD6620 | CODLING Paul | 23/01/2023 | 23/01/2023 | 31/01/2026 |
PHD8048 | COCKROFT Peter John | 22/11/2021 | 22/11/2021 | 30/11/2024 |
PHD8385 | CILOTI Asim | 18/04/2024 | 18/04/2024 | 17/08/2026 |