Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A2170 | HUTCHINSON Ellie | Rendlesham Parish Council | 01/03/2024 | 29/03/2024 | 28/03/2025 |
L&A0196 | POTTER Carol | Peasenhall Assembly Hall | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2217 | RUMBOLD Linda | PCC of St Marys Woodbridge | 10/05/2024 | 10/05/2024 | 09/05/2025 |
L&A2207 | WHELAN Kate | Nacton School Association | 07/02/2024 | 07/02/2024 | 06/02/2025 |
L&A2139 | BRIGHTMORE Nicholas | Nacton & Bucklesham Under Fives | 30/10/2023 | 06/11/2023 | 05/11/2024 |
L&A2003 | LISSEMAN Pat | Martlesham Heath Aviation Society | 01/07/2024 | 12/08/2024 | 11/08/2025 |
L&A0685 | HOWARD Christopher | Martlesham Brass | 20/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1222 | PHELPS Graham | Lions Club of Felixstowe | 09/09/2024 | 16/10/2024 | 15/10/2025 |
L&A1134 | METHERELL Cecilia | Linstead Parochial Church Council | 04/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2211 | BOAST Bing | Leiston Town Bowls Club | 09/04/2024 | 09/04/2024 | 08/04/2025 |