Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A0240 | GRANT Alan | Westerfield PCC | 26/01/2024 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0250 | WARNE Tim | Wenhaston United Football Club | 15/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2216 | LEVETT Beverly | Wardens Trust | 08/05/2024 | 08/05/2024 | 07/05/2025 |
L&A0248 | SAYER David | Walpole & Cookley Playing Field Trust | 21/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1161 | KING Nigel | Waldringfield Village Hall Trust | 20/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2071 | MACE Amber | Waldringfield School Association | 22/04/2024 | 12/05/2024 | 11/05/2025 |
L&A0246 | CHALLIS Roger | Waldringfield Sailing Club | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1150 | MURPHY K | Walberswick Village Fete | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0667 | WITMORE Elizabeth | Trimley St Mary School Association | 30/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0533 | DAVIS Mark | Trimley PCC | 12/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |