Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A1134 | METHERELL Cecilia | Linstead Parochial Church Council | 04/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0231 | GUNSON David | Sutton Recreational Ground & Memorial Trust | 05/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0228 | FLEMING John | Suffolk Horse Society | 06/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2205 | YOUNG Henry | Britten Pears Arts | 06/12/2023 | 06/12/2023 | 05/12/2024 |
L&A1166 | STYLES Mark | Ipswich Speedway Supporters Club | 06/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0368 | NEGUS Paul | Kirton Church PCC | 08/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0533 | DAVIS Mark | Trimley PCC | 12/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0473 | NEWSTEAD Vicki | Snape School Parent & Staff Association | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1143 | HORNBERGER Elizabeth | Suffolk Federation of Young Farmers Club | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1125 | GEARY Ernest | 1st Martlesham Scout HQ | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |