Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A2221 | ROLLAND Peter | Witnesham Wasps Football Club | 03/07/2024 | 03/07/2024 | 02/07/2025 |
L&A2118 | CHITTOCK Yvonne | Heartbeat East Suffolk | 08/07/2024 | 10/08/2024 | 09/08/2025 |
L&A0137 | BUSHNELL William | Hollesley All Saints PCC | 08/07/2024 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2147 | EUSTACE Kerry | Badingham Playschool | 16/07/2024 | 18/08/2024 | 17/08/2025 |
L&A1254 | KEEBLE Trudi | RSPCA Suffolk Central Branch | 12/08/2024 | 30/09/2024 | 29/09/2025 |
L&A2149 | BOOTHER Richard | Woodbridge Constituency Labour Party - Fund Raising Group | 13/08/2024 | 09/09/2024 | 08/09/2025 |
L&A1252 | HALE Fraser | The Long Shop Project Trust | 13/08/2024 | 10/09/2024 | 09/09/2025 |
L&A2179 | POTTER Gemma | Wickham Market School Association | 29/08/2024 | 16/08/2024 | 15/08/2025 |
L&A1222 | PHELPS Graham | Lions Club of Felixstowe | 09/09/2024 | 16/10/2024 | 15/10/2025 |
L&A2180 | HAYHOW David | Ipswich Gilbert & Sullivan Society | 11/09/2024 | 04/10/2024 | 03/10/2025 |