Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A0058 | HOLDCROFT Geoffrey | Suffolk Coastal Conservative Association | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0068 | BATTLE Philip John | Felixstowe Bowls Club | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0098 | DAVIS Mark | Rotary Club of Felixstowe | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0127 | TRENTER Beverley | Grundisburgh Football Club | 20/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0135 | BRERETON Samantha | Friends of Hollesley School Association | 04/01/2024 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0137 | BUSHNELL William | Hollesley All Saints PCC | 08/07/2024 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0138 | BATHE Geraldine | Hollesley Village Hall Committee | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0153 | COMBER Celia | 1st Kesgrave Scout Group | 30/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0196 | POTTER Carol | Peasenhall Assembly Hall | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0228 | FLEMING John | Suffolk Horse Society | 06/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |