Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A0001 | NEWSON Lynda | Alde Community Council | 30/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0002 | DAS Hazel | Aldeburgh Carnival | 14/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0004 | GREEN Elizabeth | Girl Guiding Leiston District | 22/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1122 | STROUD Robin | Disability Advice Service (East Suffolk) | 04/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1125 | GEARY Ernest | 1st Martlesham Scout HQ | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1134 | METHERELL Cecilia | Linstead Parochial Church Council | 04/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1143 | HORNBERGER Elizabeth | Suffolk Federation of Young Farmers Club | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1150 | MURPHY K | Walberswick Village Fete | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1152 | GRANVILLE-GEORGE David | Kelsale Village Hall & Centre Management Committee | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1161 | KING Nigel | Waldringfield Village Hall Trust | 20/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |