L&A0231 | GUNSON David | Sutton Recreational Ground & Memorial Trust | 05/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0240 | GRANT Alan | Westerfield PCC | 26/01/2024 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0246 | CHALLIS Roger | Waldringfield Sailing Club | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0248 | SAYER David | Walpole & Cookley Playing Field Trust | 21/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0250 | WARNE Tim | Wenhaston United Football Club | 15/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0251 | BARTON Keith | Westleton Village Hall | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0257 | FRENCH Susan | Wickham Market Village Hall Trustees | 23/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0264 | MORAN Christopher Peter | Farlingaye High School Association | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0308 | REID Jennifer | Friends of Thomas Mills High School | 30/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0323 | NICHOLLS Steve | Theberton & Eastbridge Community Council | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |