Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A0264 | MORAN Christopher Peter | Farlingaye High School Association | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0308 | REID Jennifer | Friends of Thomas Mills High School | 30/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0323 | NICHOLLS Steve | Theberton & Eastbridge Community Council | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0368 | NEGUS Paul | Kirton Church PCC | 08/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0391 | KEMP Lynda | Knodishall Village Hall Committee | 13/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1036 | BAKER Paul | Brandeston 100 Club | 29/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A1038 | SCOPES Sheila | Blaxhall Fete | 16/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0637 | OVERBURY James | Framlingham Town Council | 15/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0651 | WOOLNOUGH Neville | The Fred Reynolds Centre Associated with Company of Four | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0665 | JOHNSON Ruth | Bucklesham & Foxhall Village Hall | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |