Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A2082 | GIBLIN R N | Yoxford Bowls Club | 09/11/2023 | 04/12/2023 | 03/12/2024 |
L&A1125 | GEARY Ernest | 1st Martlesham Scout HQ | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2218 | GANT Carol | Felixstowe Ferry Sailing Club | 10/05/2024 | 10/05/2024 | 09/05/2025 |
L&A0257 | FRENCH Susan | Wickham Market Village Hall Trustees | 23/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2125 | FOY Lydia | Kingsfleet School Association | 13/03/2024 | 14/02/2024 | 13/02/2025 |
L&A0228 | FLEMING John | Suffolk Horse Society | 06/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2220 | FLEMING Frances | Earl Soham C P School PTFA | 20/06/2024 | 20/06/2024 | 19/06/2025 |
L&A2147 | EUSTACE Kerry | Badingham Playschool | 16/07/2024 | 18/08/2024 | 17/08/2025 |
L&A2113 | DUCKETT Claire | Broke Hall Home School Association | 13/03/2024 | 25/04/2024 | 24/04/2025 |
L&A2128 | DOUSE Jonathan | 5th Woodbridge Sea Scouts | 04/03/2024 | 10/04/2024 | 09/04/2025 |