Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A2202 | NEAL Jon | Suffolk Mind | 19/09/2024 | 30/10/2024 | 29/10/2025 |
L&A1205 | NEAL Sally | Heath CP School Parents & Friends Association | 30/10/2023 | 04/11/2023 | 03/11/2024 |
L&A0368 | NEGUS Paul | Kirton Church PCC | 08/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0001 | NEWSON Lynda | Alde Community Council | 30/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0473 | NEWSTEAD Vicki | Snape School Parent & Staff Association | 14/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0323 | NICHOLLS Steve | Theberton & Eastbridge Community Council | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0637 | OVERBURY James | Framlingham Town Council | 15/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2195 | PAGE Irene | Gorseland School Parent & Friends Association | 10/05/2024 | 18/05/2024 | 17/05/2025 |
L&A2051 | PALMER Rebecca | Friends of Fairfield | 11/06/2024 | 18/06/2024 | 17/06/2025 |
L&A2158 | PARKER Lyn | Cotton Club Quilters | 25/09/2023 | 15/10/2023 | 14/10/2024 |