Licence Number | Name | Operator Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
L&A2036 | ANDERSON J | Deben Rowing Club | 04/09/2023 | 25/09/2023 | 24/09/2024 |
L&A2053 | ANDREWS C J | Alderton Parish Council | 10/06/2024 | 04/07/2024 | 03/07/2025 |
L&A1036 | BAKER Paul | Brandeston 100 Club | 29/12/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2199 | BAKER Paul | Brandeston PCC | 27/06/2024 | 31/07/2024 | 30/07/2025 |
L&A0045 | BALLANTINE Heather | Darsham Village Hall Management Committee | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0251 | BARTON Keith | Westleton Village Hall | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0138 | BATHE Geraldine | Hollesley Village Hall Committee | 10/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0068 | BATTLE Philip John | Felixstowe Bowls Club | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A0462 | BICKNELL Elaine | Friends of St Marys School | 09/11/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 |
L&A2188 | BLOOMFIELD Sandra | Framlingham Sports Club | 13/03/2024 | 13/04/2024 | 12/04/2025 |